Trustees mySociety

Charity number: 1076346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Genevieve Eleanor Maitland Hudson Chair 06 July 2023
None on record
Jennifer Francis Thornton Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Devin Sean O'Shaughnessy Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Steven James Skelton Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Ade Adewunmi Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Amanda Brown Trustee 11 March 2019
HORNSBY HOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: 17 days late
Tony Burton Trustee 22 August 2016
WANDLE VALLEY REGIONAL PARK TRUST
Received: On time
CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND
Received: On time
MITCHAM CRICKET GREEN COMMUNITY & HERITAGE
Received: On time
Rachel Emily Rank Trustee 22 August 2016
None on record