WORLD FEDERATION OF NEUROLOGY

Charity number: 1068673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £526.10k £2.05m £652.17k £1.00m £666.72k
Total expenditure £541.69k £651.46k £694.79k £761.04k £625.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.49k £19.92k £10.05k £7.85k £56.70k
Income - Other trading activities £132.79k £135.06k £148.41k £166.97k £173.40k
Income - Charitable activities £334.50k £1.85m £443.17k £767.09k £391.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £41.31k £45.74k £50.53k £58.71k £45.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £530.30k £639.82k £682.81k £748.85k £613.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.39k £11.64k £11.99k £12.19k £12.13k
Expenditure - Governance £53.55k £60.01k £77.34k £78.06k £51.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution -£29.88k £45.99k £126.08k £49.15k £86.59k
Expenditure - Investment management £11.39k £11.64k £11.99k £12.19k £12.13k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0