Financial history MERCHANT TAYLORS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1063740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £22.51m £23.63m £24.31m £24.04m £26.03m
Total expenditure £21.10m £21.40m £22.77m £22.49m £23.45m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £909.91k £289.32k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.39m £580.62k £522.26k £328.29k £1.64m
Income - Other trading activities £123.01k £105.98k £117.87k £56.83k £104.08k
Income - Charitable activities £21.89m £22.78m £23.53m £23.53m £24.22m
Income - Endowments £998.68k £8.50k £0 £7.06k £10.50k
Income - Investment £99.84k £107.82k £132.74k £130.68k £79.11k
Income - Other £8.40k £66.67k £800 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £31.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.84m £21.11m £22.48m £22.22m £23.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £252.95k £291.28k £287.19k £271.52k £226.77k
Expenditure - Governance £25.55k £29.52k £30.48k £27.94k £26.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £9.53k £12.50k £14.37k £14.85k £18.02k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0