SPORTAC 76 LIMITED

Charity number: 1063653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Teaching of Acrobatic Gymnastics to young people of Feltham Middlesex and surrounding areas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £14,882
Total expenditure: £30,681

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY BALL Chair
None on record
Jodie Louise Harding Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Tania Noble Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
DIANE FLINT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.86k £49.55k £19.02k £20.90k £14.88k
Total expenditure £19.74k £15.75k £21.99k £23.96k £30.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 Blacksmith Close
SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
Middlesex
TW166BF
Phone:
07528407601