Trustees Age UK Enfield

Charity number: 1063696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Patricia Adkin Chair 08 December 2020
None on record
Mari Clwyd EDWARDS Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Joseph Daniel Harley Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
ALISON de METZ Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
MICHAEL ZACHARIA Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Nicola Hyde Trustee 08 December 2021
ENFIELD CROQUET CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
Nicolas Wan Thoung Kee Mew Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
ANNE SMOL MBE Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
BERYL ANTOINETTE DE SOUZA Trustee 16 February 2017
ENFIELD RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL
Received: On time
SANDRA KIRWAN Trustee 24 November 2016
None on record