Accounts and annual returns CALDECOTT FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 307889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window