Financial history CALDECOTT FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 307889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.22m £7.17m £8.16m £8.82m £8.72m
Total expenditure £6.42m £6.60m £8.14m £8.45m £8.11m
Income from government contracts £5.74m £6.23m £7.67m £8.15m £8.01m
Income from government grants £322.59k £353.17k £369.38k £496.14k £631.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £124.45k £579.13k £98.22k £168.61k £77.36k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.06m £6.58m £8.04m £8.65m £8.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.83k £213 £1.18k £1.71k £47
Income - Other £34.10k £5.81k £14.61k £5.65k £70.08k
Income - Legacies £0 £480.00k £18.40k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.42m £6.60m £8.13m £8.45m £8.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £520 £2.01k £2.52k £700 £482
Expenditure - Governance £125.89k £102.67k £134.93k £126.81k £97.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.15k