Accounts and annual returns THE TIBET RELIEF FUND OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1061834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 25 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 25 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 14 March 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 14 March 2019 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window