Financial history THE TIBET RELIEF FUND OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1061834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £517.00k £790.51k £404.31k £436.44k £544.32k
Total expenditure £635.50k £767.30k £915.90k £970.93k £902.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £40.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £433.58k £706.05k N/A N/A £472.68k
Income - Other trading activities £25.54k £23.15k N/A N/A £31.74k
Income - Charitable activities £6.89k £6.96k N/A N/A £5.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £50.99k £54.35k N/A N/A £34.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £70.22k £387.40k N/A N/A £18.05k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £420.41k £506.44k N/A N/A £606.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £188.36k £260.86k N/A N/A £295.94k
Expenditure - Governance £18.53k £19.53k N/A N/A £24.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £244.50k £0 N/A N/A £325.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £16.63k £16.50k N/A N/A £9.86k
Expenditure - Other £26.74k £0 N/A N/A £0