THE TIBET RELIEF FUND OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1061834
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Gordon Muffett Trustee 07 October 2017 None on record
PHILIP WILSON Chair 02 December 2014 None on record
Thomas Madelin Trustee 13 December 2017 None on record
Rosemary Zara Fleming Trustee 08 December 2019 None on record
Rebecca Chick Trustee 15 March 2017 None on record