Trustees THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR BLIND CHILDREN

Charity number: 307892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patrick Plant Chair 01 January 2023
None on record
Sabira Mehboob Hasham Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Helen Mary Jones Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Dr Ameenat Olufunmilola Solebo Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Celso Zuccollo Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Callum Russell Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
John Richard Miller Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
Fazilet Hadi Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
Peter Richard Andrew Knott Trustee 18 May 2017
None on record
John Gibson Heller Trustee 23 February 2017
PARISH ROOM
Received: On time
Professor Martin Doel CBE Trustee 26 November 2015
THE CHALLENGE NETWORK
Charity is insolvent
CVQO LTD
Received: On time
Valarie Marlene May Trustee 03 August 2012
None on record