Accounts and annual returns LEARNING SPACE

Charity number: 1061545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window