Accounts and annual returns GUILDFORD FLAMES JUNIOR TRAINING PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1065691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 10 October 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 14 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required