Accounts and annual returns SENIOR CITIZENS SOCIETY (SPITALFIELDS)

Charity number: 1062543
Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 477 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 842 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 842 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1207 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1207 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1573 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1573 days