Financial history AGE UK LAMBETH

Charity number: 1063497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.46m £1.48m £1.47m £1.71m £2.66m
Total expenditure £1.47m £1.45m £1.49m £1.54m £2.69m
Income from government contracts £1.11m £1.23m £1.38m £1.68m £1.84m
Income from government grants £87.89k £34.00k N/A N/A £75.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £17.49k £9.43k £19.88k £9.20k £142.01k
Income - Other trading activities £34.31k £41.95k £66.97k £25.50k £16.78k
Income - Charitable activities £1.41m £1.43m £1.38m £1.68m £2.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £734 £288 £1.24k £1.84k £333
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £4.33k £0 £5.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.45m £1.48m £1.54m £2.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.52k £3.50k £0 £0 £9.03k
Expenditure - Governance £3.50k £0 £0 £3.70k £5.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £3.60k £0 £0