Trustees MANOR GARDENS WELFARE TRUST LTD
Charity number: 1063053

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Sutherland | Chair | 16 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Iris Tuechter | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pardeep Bhatti | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey O'Brien | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Morrison | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Tait | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Inara Khan | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CRYSTAL ROLFE | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.