THE CORPORATION OF ST LAWRENCE COLLEGE

Charity number: 307921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 03 May 2017 On time Download