Financial history THE CORPORATION OF ST LAWRENCE COLLEGE

Charity number: 307921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.93m £11.57m £11.29m £9.93m £8.42m
Total expenditure £10.45m £10.95m £11.56m £10.78m £10.04m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £986.28k £157.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £581.25k £647.80k £190.34k £1.11m £204.73k
Income - Other trading activities £149.54k £162.91k £177.60k £123.47k £53.83k
Income - Charitable activities £10.18m £10.73m £10.89m £8.68m £8.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.11k £31.19k £26.28k £18.86k £28.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.45m £10.87m £11.46m £10.72m £10.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £14.71k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £83.45k £102.46k £66.71k £19.01k