THE CORPORATION OF ST LAWRENCE COLLEGE

Charity number: 307921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL JOHN BOLTON Trustee 18 July 2013 None on record
ALISON BURGESS TCNFFACP Trustee None on record
JONATHAN TAPP BSc Trustee None on record
GILLIAN PAGE Trustee None on record
TIM TOWNSEND Trustee 27 April 2011 None on record
NICK MARCHANT Trustee None on record
Simon Charles Nicholas Pullen Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
Melissa Millin Trustee 08 February 2019 None on record
Graham Carter FRICSFCABE Trustee 14 October 2016 None on record
JAMES STEWART LASLETT BAHONSFCMA Trustee 21 March 2015 None on record