Financial history SIMON LANGTON SCHOOLS

Charity number: 307941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £87.28k £38.23k £33.56k £109.01k £27.83k
Total expenditure £50.58k £9.14k £543.06k £51.20k £92.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A