WYKE REGIS PRE - SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a committee run Pre-school (parent run) where children learn through play as specified by Ofsted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 November 1972: Standard registration
- WYKE REGIS PRE- SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- WYKE REGIS PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Jane Jones | Chair | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jenkins | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna-Louise Osbourne | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Walbrin | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.34k | £87.71k | £92.30k | £105.64k | £109.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.17k | £105.05k | £86.64k | £92.47k | £105.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH FEBRUARY 1972, AMENDED 29TH JUNE 1995.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING PLAY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN FROM 3-5 YEARS OLD.
Area of benefit
WEYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHRUBBERY LANE
WEYMOUTH
DORSET
DT4 9LU
- Phone:
- 01305789222
- Email:
- wykeplaygroup@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window