KENNET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 308095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time Download