KENNET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 308095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £40.32k £32.82k £26.93k £34.36k £37.84k
Total expenditure £34.67k £30.71k £37.53k £26.96k £14.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £20.52k