Accounts and annual returns 6TH HASTINGS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 December 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 December 2021 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 December 2021 784 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 December 2021 1149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required