Financial history 2ND NORTH WATFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.27k £9.96k £16.98k £19.32k £19.74k
Total expenditure £11.90k £10.03k £12.12k £16.96k £16.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k