Financial history 1ST CAPEL ST MARY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.18k £8.81k £7.48k £21.11k £4.75k
Total expenditure £7.96k £12.35k £9.06k £2.92k £4.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.96k N/A