5TH PUTNEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.53k £2.78k £8.77k £10.73k £10.44k
Total expenditure £6.29k £7.10k £16.37k £4.99k £8.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A