THE CARPENTERS AND DOCKLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 308272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 February 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time Download