THE CARPENTERS AND DOCKLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 308272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £227.02k £235.02k £259.30k £298.29k £282.13k
Total expenditure £156.78k £273.57k £303.60k £327.80k £316.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A