THE CARPENTERS AND DOCKLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 308272

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN STEAD Chair None on record
Montague Meyer Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Shalini Sharma Trustee 10 November 2019 None on record
Philip Elson Trustee 09 December 2015 None on record
Curt Fahndrich Trustee 01 May 2014
THE DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS
Martin Young Trustee 29 May 2012
TOWER HAMLETS COMMUNITY TRANSPORT Received: On time
THE ATTLEE FOUNDATION Received: 60 days late
THE DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS
Tracy Anne Cunningham Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
MARK PATRICK SEEBOLD HORN BENG MSC Trustee
THE DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS