HINTON ST GEORGE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 308303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 February 2019 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 February 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 February 2018 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 February 2017 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required