HINTON ST GEORGE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 308303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.68k £67.04k £17.09k £14.32k £15.09k
Total expenditure £8.43k £86.93k £17.03k £11.94k £16.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £850 £12.00k N/A N/A N/A