LIVERPOOL PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITY

Charity number: 1061581
Charity reporting is overdue by 1036 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 305 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 305 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1036 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1036 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required