THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ( NORTHERN PROVINCE) TRUST LTD.

Charity number: 1132154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER BROOKE MATTHEW Trustee None on record
GORDON IAN WANLESS Trustee 05 April 2020
THE GHANAIAN CHILDREN'S TRUST Received: On time
Dr HEATHER JEAN FINLAYSON Trustee 19 March 2016 None on record
Rev David Grosch-Miller Chair 06 July 2017
CONGREGATIONAL AND GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
JANE TOMLIN Trustee 19 March 2016 None on record
JEAN WHITE BARR Trustee 05 October 2019
ST JAMES'S ALNWICK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
CAROL HOGG Trustee 11 March 2017 None on record
WILLIAM DUNCAN Trustee 01 January 2021
NORTHERN COLLEGE (UNITED REFORMED AND CONGREGATIONAL) Received: On time