Trustees ALL SAINTS MILLENNIUM TRUST (DARLINGTON) LIMITED

Charity number: 1061725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Anne English Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN SHEPHERD Trustee 02 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' AND SALUTATION, BLACKWELL, DARLINGTON
Received: On time
Rev Jennifer Sara Croft Trustee 10 March 2020
THE ABBEYFIELD (DARLINGTON) SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' AND SALUTATION, BLACKWELL, DARLINGTON
Received: On time
Alison Agnes Mannion Trustee 10 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' AND SALUTATION, BLACKWELL, DARLINGTON
Received: On time
Dr ALFRED COLIN PRICE Trustee 18 April 2018
THE DURHAM DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' AND SALUTATION, BLACKWELL, DARLINGTON
Received: On time
PHILIP ELLIOTT-LYALL Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
David John Elliott Trustee 05 July 2016
None on record
DAVID CURRAN Trustee 22 April 2015
None on record
DEBORAH WASTNEDGE Trustee 14 October 2012
None on record
PAMELA MARY DAVISON Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' AND SALUTATION, BLACKWELL, DARLINGTON
Received: On time
ALISON MORAG BARKER Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' AND SALUTATION, BLACKWELL, DARLINGTON
Received: On time