SHINFIELD ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST (PIGGATT AND FEILDE FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 309050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £536 £540 £540 £540 £0
Total expenditure £536 £540 £540 £540 £3
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A