ST LUKE'S TRUST (BERKSHIRE)

Charity number: 309076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £465.80k £457.15k £450.32k £464.37k £265.86k
Total expenditure £378.30k £394.85k £468.23k £626.07k £521.02k
Income from government contracts £421.13k £412.25k £399.47k £390.42k £201.25k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A