HEATHFIELD SCHOOL

Charity number: 309086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 15 March 2017 On time Download