ST ANDREW'S COLLEGE, BRADFIELD

Charity number: 309089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £25.68m £27.33m £28.06m £29.87m £28.06m
Total expenditure £24.52m £25.74m £26.87m £28.33m £29.31m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £114.86k £181.00k £96.00k £221.21k £617.16k
Income - Other trading activities £2.04m £2.55m £2.62m £2.69m £1.34m
Income - Charitable activities £23.26m £24.51m £25.25m £26.86m £24.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £110.94k £87.86k £94.00k £100.10k £184.13k
Income - Other £160.53k £0 £3.00k £0 £1.20m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.02m £22.92m £23.97m £25.42m £26.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £2.82m £2.90m £2.90m £3.27m
Expenditure - Governance £214.11k £273.92k £228.00k £239.05k £289.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.49m £0 £0 £0 £0