BAKEHOUSE OR SHEPHERD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 309173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 August 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 14 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required