BAKEHOUSE OR SHEPHERD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 309173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £4.95k £6.18k £4.34k £4.85k £4.70k
Total expenditure £1.60k £7.58k £5.20k £3.35k £3.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A