WILLIAM DICKASON'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 May 2020 07 April 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2019 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2018 18 September 2019 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2016 Not Required