WILLIAM DICKASON'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/05/2016 28/05/2017 28/05/2018 28/05/2019 28/05/2020
Total gross income £297 £297 £235 £318 £323
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A