Financial history ST PETER'S COLLEGE, RADLEY

Charity number: 309243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £28.61m £28.62m £31.05m £28.81m £32.29m
Total expenditure £25.84m £27.19m £28.78m £28.59m £30.56m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £886.00k £639.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.59m £1.43m £2.06m £2.34m £2.17m
Income - Other trading activities £968.00k £1.04m £1.07m £560.00k £437.00k
Income - Charitable activities £24.35m £24.95m £26.56m £24.55m £27.84m
Income - Endowments £50.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £711.00k £1.21m £1.36m £1.37m £1.84m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £236.62k £38.39k £8.66k £21.00k £40.55k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.41m £25.45m £26.95m £27.00m £28.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.44m £1.74m £1.83m £1.59m £1.67m
Expenditure - Governance £102.00k £109.00k £131.00k £122.00k £114.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £100.00k £105.00k £173.00k £213.00k £283.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0