BEAR CLUB FOUNDATION (CHARITY OF JAMES MAYNARD)

Charity number: 309457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 July 2019 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required