Accounts and annual returns JOHN BENTLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 309477
Charity reporting is overdue by 631 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 December 2020 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required