Financial history BISHOP WORDSWORTH EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 309502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £30.25k £30.38k £30.56k £28.27k £29.91k
Total expenditure £30.51k £15.60k £19.50k £2.66k £33.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A