Trustees BISHOP WORDSWORTH EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 309502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Louise Allender Mrs Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Sharon Hallis Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
Rev Kelvin Inglis Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Philip Musselwhite Trustee 21 April 2017
None on record
Joy Tubbs Trustee 06 May 2014
THE REVEREND DOCTOR S F JACKSON AND MRS JACKSON MAPPOWDER TRUST
Received: On time
SARUM ST MICHAEL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Edward Cleasby Probert M BA Trustee
SALISBURY CHAMBER CHORUS
Received: On time
THE COLLEGE OF MATRONS
Received: On time
SALISBURY TRUST FOR THE HOMELESS LTD
Received: On time