Accounts and annual returns WOODSTOCK EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required