Trustees WITNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 309645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT WILLIAM BARTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Campbell Bird | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachel Crouch | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Lisa Cherry | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Collicutt | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Liz Duncan | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Williams | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bryant | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MILLS OBE | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Jeanette Baker | Trustee | 27 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Chris Woodward | Trustee | 11 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN ENRIGHT | Trustee | 27 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.